judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TREACHANNA MATTHEWS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0198
Short Caption:TREACHANNA MATTHEWS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD10262-10Filed Date:02/17/2011

Opening Event Date:02/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTreachanna Matthews Y
Jane Carol NormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/17/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/18/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jane Norman, Esquire
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jane Norman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to February 18, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (103pgs/Tape) 1/11/11 proc. w/CD
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/20/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (ex parte request for court order directing issuance of an investing- tion expert services voucher filed 1/28/11)
04/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 28, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
07/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - aplt's brief and appdx (Appellant)Granted
08/18/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and the lodged appellant's brief and limited appendix are filed and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/16/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (aple)
09/19/2011FiledTMC/MOTOIN FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledOrder Granting MOET and OPPOSITION SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 7, 2011
10/06/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledOrder Granting SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed
12/13/2011FiledMandate