judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TENNESSEE GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY v. TERESA FROMME

Case: A-4505
A-4505
02/08/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TENNESSEE GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY
TERESA FROMME
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/17/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/26/1954Opinion issued
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
02/17/1954Response to Petition
02/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Teresa FrommeRespondent
Tennessee Gas Transmission CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information