judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENNIS (TERRY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 34632
Short Caption:DENNIS (TERRY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990611Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/29/2000 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/29/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/06/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 4 (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-07268
08/06/1999ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Placed in correspondence file. 99-07269
08/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-07506
08/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Opening brief due: 10/15/99 Answering brief due: 12/14/99 Reply brief due: 01/28/00. 99-07915
08/27/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Placed in correspondence file: notice of Warrant of Execution and copy of Warrant of Execution received on July 23, 1999; and notice of Stay of Execution and copy of Order Staying Execution Pending Direct Appeal received on July 26, 1999.
10/18/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10055
10/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: 7 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with SCR 250 (6)(d). (Do not track for appendix. ROA filed 08/06/99.ah) 99-10501
10/26/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. 99-10502
12/17/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/14/99. 99-12834
01/24/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 1/21/00. 00-01062
01/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter directing the Washoe County Clerk to transmit State's Exhibit 17 (videotape). 00-01329
02/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This is an appeal from a judgment of conviction of first degree murder and a sentence of death. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument on March 29, 2000, at 2:30 p.m. in Carson City, before the en banc court: 30 minutes. 00-02129
03/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-04133
03/29/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB
12/04/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Becker, J. We concur: Rose, C.J., Young, J., Maupin, J., Shearing, J., Agosti, J., Leavitt, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 113. En Banc. 00-21066
12/26/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: December 22, 2000. 00-22429
01/23/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." En Banc-WM/CY/MSDA/RR/ML/NB 01-01429
02/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 4 this day. Returned Exhibits: Exhibit 17 - Unredacted Videotape this day. 01-01492
02/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2001. 01-01492