judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-292)
Parent:06-292Case Docketed On:12/28/2006
Consolidated: S-07-0062
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry Earl Neidlinger Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Daniel Michael Fetsco

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 204
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/13/2007Motion - ExpediteMotionBrief onlyFinal
02/14/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Other, Received Amended Notice of Appeal, UntimelyNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/20/2007Motion - Consolidate with No. 07-62MotionConsolidateFinal
03/22/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/21/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
07/31/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/21/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirmed in part and reversed and remanded in part. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card from WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/7/08 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal