judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INTERSTATE GENERAL CORP. RAC

Case Information: 81-AA-1231
Short Caption:INTERSTATE GENERAL CORP. RACClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/09/1981

Opening Event Date:10/09/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901INTERSTATE GENERAL CORP. RAC
10/09/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1981FiledRecord Completed
04/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
06/21/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/08/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition