judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RILEY S. WALLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0194
Short Caption:RILEY S. WALLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1788-94Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRiley S. Walls YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/29/1971 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (dfe)
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 15, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
03/09/2011RECORD INDEX
03/09/2011RECORD COPIES
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Time frame not specified).
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 20 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 3, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extensioin of time to file the brief and limited appendix within 20 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (Castillo)
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
06/28/2011LodgedRECEIVED Appellant's appendix to brief.
07/22/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the appendix and the lodged appendix is filed.
07/22/2011Filedappellant's appendix (Appellant)
08/03/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
09/07/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/20/2011FiledGranted motion for summary affirmance. (BRTHTE)
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
01/10/2012FiledLetter To pro se appellant returning the pleading entitled "Notice of Appeal" and informing appellant that he may file a petition for rehearing accompanied by a motion to file it out of time.
01/11/2012FiledMandate
01/25/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc. (Appellant)
01/25/2012LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged petition for reh/reh en banc and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition.
02/02/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
03/07/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.