judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN TINSLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0189
Short Caption:CALVIN TINSLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 11-CF-0090 Consolidated:11-CF-0189
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-29182-07Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/11/2013
Argued/Submitted:06/12/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/06/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin Tinsley Y
Stephen D. ScavuzzoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kathryn L. RakoczyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (64 pgs/Kaczorowski) 1/4/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (78 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 7/9/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (112 pgs/Ramos) 7/13/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (122 pgs/Ramos) 7/14/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (16 pgs/tape) 7/28/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (173 pgs/Graybill) 8/16/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (420 pgs/Davis) 8/17-18/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (421-636 pgs/Davis) 8/19/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (637-1159 pgs/Davis) 8/23-24/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (1160-1611 pgs/Davis) 8/25-26/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (445 pgs/Kaczorowski) 8/30/-9/1/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (17 pgs/Eteckochay) 1/28/11 proc w/cd
06/01/2011RECORD INDEX
06/01/2011RECORD COPIES
06/01/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (SEALED orders)
06/21/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 11-CF-90 and 11-CF-189 for all purposes herein. It is F/O that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed w/in 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed w/in 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - for 90 days (Tinsley) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Washington's motion for extension to 11/22/11.
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Tinsley's motion for extension to 10/31/11.
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 90 days (Tinsley) (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (4 pgs/tape) 7/13/10 proc w/cd
11/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Washington) 21 days after co-def files his brief.
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the briefs and limited appendixes.
12/09/2011FiledGRANT - AMENDED Order Granting Appellants motions for extensions of time to file the briefs and limited appendixes
01/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to April 30, 2012 Appendix, Brief (Appellant-- Tinsley)
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to April 30, 2012 Appendix, Brief (Appellant-- Tinsley)
04/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until June 29, 2012 (Appellant, Tinsley)Granted
05/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until June 29, 2012 (Appellant, Tinsley)
06/19/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant, Tinsley)Granted
06/27/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant, Tinsley)
06/27/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Stephen Scavuzzo, Esquire (Appellant)
07/06/2012LodgedMotion for Release of Discovery based upon counsel's motion for leave withdraw as counsel and for this Court to Appoint New Counsel (Appellant)
07/24/2012FiledLetter To Stephen Scavuzzo, Esq., referring Tinsley's motion to atty
09/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Tinsley) (Appellant)Granted
10/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Tinsley) (Appellant) to 10/10/12
10/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/23/2012FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Washington) (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
12/05/2012FiledOrder Granting motion for an extension of time and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix.
12/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant Tinsley)
12/05/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant Tinsley)
12/05/2012FiledOrder Denying motion to stay without prejudice to its renewal upon the filing of the D.C. Code 23-110 motion in the trial court.
12/18/2012FiledStatement regarding appellant's reponse to court's court's order of 12/5/12 (Appellant)
12/18/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) (Washington)
12/18/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) (Washington)
01/15/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/17/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) by 2/22/13
01/29/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (Response to governement's motion in limmine concerning oral argument)
02/22/2013FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/26/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES
03/11/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/11/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/11/2013FiledBriefing Completed
03/19/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/21/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/21/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/12/2013FiledArgued Before Judges Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Pryor, Stephen D. Scavuzzo, Esq. for appellant Thomas D. Engle, Esq. for appellant Kathryn L. Rakoczy, Esq. for appellee
07/01/2013FiledLetter From Appellant titled as (Motion to Stay Pending Investigation) (Appellant)
07/15/2013FiledLetter To counsel for appellant from Clerk referring a pleading entitled "Appellant's motion to stay pending investigation."
07/26/2013FiledLetter From appellant's attorney re: 7/15/13 letter from court (Appellant)
08/14/2013FiledPro Se Motion To Stay Appeal pending investigation and filing of a D.C. Code 23-110 motion in the trial court. (Appellant Washington) (Served on appellee by the court.)Denied
02/06/2014FiledOrder Denying pro se motions.
02/11/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ)(Washington, Chief Judge; Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge; and Pryor, Senior Judge)
02/21/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Washington) (Appellant)
03/06/2014FiledMandate (BOTH CASES)
04/18/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and Motion to Appoint Counsel (Appellant- Washington)Denied
04/22/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
10/07/2014FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE