judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ARTEAGA (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38363
Short Caption:ARTEAGA (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42308
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P1227Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14288
08/23/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 11, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. 01-14338
08/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14822
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. Alternatively, appellant shall show cause, within the same time period, why sanctions should not be imposed. 01-16922
10/11/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-17180
11/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A copy of the transcript request form filed in the district court is attached to appellant's certificate filed on October 11, 2001. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we waive that portion of NRAP 9(a) that requires the transcript request form to be filed in this court. Additionally, the court reporter having filed the requested transcript in this court on August 23, 2001, appellant need not include portions of the transcript in the appendix. 01-19582
12/12/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/12/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-20850
12/12/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-20853
01/14/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01/11/02. 02-00940
03/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
06/26/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11027
07/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11181
07/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2002. 02-11181