judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES CREEL and BRENDA CREEL v. L & L, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, LEW LEPORE and MIKE LEPORE

Case Heading (S-11-0138)
Case Number:S-11-0138Case Docketed On:06/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JAMES CREEL and BRENDA CREEL v. L & L, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, LEW LEPORE and MIKE LEPORE
Full Title:JAMES CREEL and BRENDA CREEL, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. L & L, INC., A Wyoming Corporation, LEW LEPORE and MIKE LEPORE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames CreelRichard J. Gage
AppellantBrenda CreelRichard J. Gage
AppelleeL & L, a Wyoming corporationGrant Robert Curry
Monty L. Barnett
AppelleeLew LeporeGrant Robert Curry
Monty L. Barnett
AppelleeMike LeporeGrant Robert Curry
Monty L. Barnett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 124
Citation:287 P.3d 729

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Grant R. Curry for appellees.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - entry of appearance of Grant R. Curry for appellees.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
07/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Opening Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Answer Brief (Brief of Appellees) and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2011Brief - Petitioner reply (Appellants' reply brief)BriefPetitioner replyFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Gage for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Monty L. Barnett for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Hill.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/26/2011Order - Assignment of judge John C. Brooks, District Judge to act in this matter (Justice Hill recused)OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/31/2011Order - Assignment of Judge Tyler to act in this matter for Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/03/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/03/2011Order - Assignment of judge - W. Thomas Sullins, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Chief Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/09/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justice Golden and Voigt, and District Judges Sullins, Brooks and Tyler (Richard J. Gage for appellants; Monty L. Barnett and Grant R. Curry, argument by Mr. Barnett for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the Court, District Judge Tyler files a dissenting opinion in which District Judge Sullins joinsOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/02/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/04/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 10/3/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal