judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INT'L ASSOC. OF BLACK PROFESSIONALS V. ANGELIQUE M. DAVIS

Case Information: 11-AA-0235
Short Caption:INT'L ASSOC. OF BLACK PROFESSIONALS V. ANGELIQUE M. DAVISClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01532-10Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerInternational Association of Black ProfessionalsN
Devarieste Curry NN
RespondentAngelique M. Davis N
John C. KeeneyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/01/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/01/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/08/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
07/26/2011LodgedReceived - A courtsey copy of a ltr sent to petitioner from OAH regarding preparation and cost of transcript (OAH)
08/18/2011LodgedReceived - ltr to OAH with check for transcription cost & CD. (Petitioner)
08/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
08/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/29/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
09/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (hearing of 8/5 & 10/26/2010)
10/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 11/14/11
10/03/2011FiledAppearance of John C. Keeney on behalf of respondent (Respondent)
10/27/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw as Counsel (Petitioner)Denied as Moot
11/14/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)Granted
12/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner) & Deny as moot motion to withdraw
12/01/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate