judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOWEN (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34633
Short Caption:BOWEN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151071Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07279
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 8/4/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on August 4, 1999. 99-09181
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11133
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/11/00. 00-02310
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court for an evidentiary hearing to determine wheter or not counsel's performance fell below an objective standard of reasonableness. 00-11183
07/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Answer to Order to Show Cause. 00-13024
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . .we remand this matter to the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing on the issue of whether appellant's counsel failed to file a notice of appeal after appellant expressed a desire to appeal." This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14297
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14477
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14477