judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CYRIL K. RICHARD v. DONNA TAYLOR RICHARD

Case Heading (S-07-0038)
Case Number:S-07-0038Case Docketed On:02/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CYRIL K. RICHARD v. DONNA TAYLOR RICHARD
Full Title:CYRIL K. RICHARD, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DONNA TAYLOR RICHARD, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCyril K. RichardWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppelleeDonna Taylor RichardLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 180
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/23/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
06/07/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/27/2007Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/28/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Original Papers, Transcript and Confidential Packet; Volume III, Designation of Expert Witnesses and Supplemental DesignationsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/29/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/29/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal