judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WOMACK (JARAMIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38364
Short Caption:WOMACK (JARAMIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38617 , 55129 , 56416 , 61127 , 65760 , 67077 , 67077-COA , 67180 , 76967 , 76967-COA , 81785
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162494Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14291
10/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 10/15/01--TRANSFERRED TO NO. 38617. This NOA was originally filed in no. 38364, but was removed and docketed as a separate appeal. 01-16819
11/20/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38275, 38334, 38364, 38412, 38415, 38472. 01-19442
03/25/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. 02-05282
03/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn24 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 38364/38617 - not consolidated. 02-11413
07/30/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11617
07/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 1, 2002. 02-11617