Case: 02-96-00532-CR
02-96-00532-CR
11/18/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Delgado, Jessie Bernardino aka: Jessie Bernito Delgado
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/26/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/04/1998 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/26/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/24/1997 | Submitted | | |
11/24/1997 | Submission | | |
11/03/1997 | Letter | | |
10/31/1997 | Submission | | |
05/19/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
05/19/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/14/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
02/26/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/18/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/22/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/17/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/18/1996 | Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits | | |
11/18/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Delgado, Jessie Bernardino Aka | Criminal - Appellant | Mary B. Thornton |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Tim Curry |
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0626023R
Ct1:50yrsIDTDCJ &$10,000fn