judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

NORTHWEST DALLAS IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION, ET AL. v. CITY OF DALLAS AND CECIL FARRELL, BUILDING INSPECTOR, BRAZIL CLESI AND SALVATORE CLESI

Case: A-4469
A-4469
01/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
NORTHWEST DALLAS IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION, ET AL.
CITY OF DALLAS AND CECIL FARRELL, BUILDING INSPECTOR, BRAZIL CLESI AND SALVATORE CLESI
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/10/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/04/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/23/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/16/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1954Reply to Response
03/12/1954Response to Motion filed
03/12/1954Response to Motion filed
03/10/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/04/1954Reply to Response
01/23/1954Response to Petition
01/16/1954Response to Petition
01/15/1954Response to Motion filed
01/14/1954Motion to Argue filed
01/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brazil Clesi and Salvatore ClesiRespondent
City of Dallas and Cecil Farrell, Building InspectorRespondent
Northwest Dallas Improvement Association, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information