judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOSEID VS. EICON

Case Information: 38353
Short Caption:MOSEID VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000061AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2001 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14146
08/21/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/3/01. Court Reporter: Deborah Middleton Greco. 01-14188
08/24/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15001
09/10/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Robert L. Eisenberg.
11/06/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18554
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-19252
11/29/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-20016
11/29/2001Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Stipulated Settlement Agreement. 01-20017
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-20983
12/13/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.