judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVIS RUSSELL and DANA RUSSELL and JOHN H. KELLERSMAN, JR. v. LLOYD SULLIVAN

Case Heading (S-11-0128)
Case Number:S-11-0128Case Docketed On:05/18/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:DAVIS RUSSELL and DANA RUSSELL and JOHN H. KELLERSMAN, JR. v. LLOYD SULLIVAN
Full Title:DAVIS RUSSELL and DANA RUSSELL, Appellants (Petitioners), and JOHN H. KELLERSMAN, JR., Appellant (Prosposed Intervenor), v. LLOYD SULLIVAN, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavis RussellM. Jalie Meinecke
AppellantDana RussellM. Jalie Meinecke
AppellantJohn H. Kellersman Jr.M. Jalie Meinecke
AppelleeLloyd SullivanStephen Joseph Darrah

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Estates - Probate
Opinion Number:2012 WY 20
Citation:270 P.3d 677

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/05/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Response to Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - M. Jalie Meinecke for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - S. Joseph Darrah for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (M. Jalie Meinecke for appellants; Stephen Joseph Darrah for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/02/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal