judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: DINESH C. VERMA

Case Information: 11-CV-0225
Short Caption:IN RE: DINESH C. VERMAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5951-09Filed Date:02/18/2011

Opening Event Date:02/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDinesh C. Verma N
Justin FlintYY
Christopher F. CopenhaverNN
AppelleeGrosvernor Urban Retail Lp.N
Michael K. Hibey NN
AppelleeBenjamin Demeo N
Kenneth R. WestNN
AppelleeRegina Demeo N
Kenneth R. WestNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 18, 2011, and the statement regarding transcripts and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3) (A). (JAC) elp
03/16/2011RECORD INDEX
03/16/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 16, 2011
04/26/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
05/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant and the appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/02/2011APPENDIX
05/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs of appellees shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/02/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on May 2, 2011, and it further appearing that the briefs of appellees were due to be filed on or before May 31, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the briefs have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit their briefs, or statement that the party will not be filing a brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or statement, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and the appellant's brief alone. (JAC) elp
06/17/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from aple (Grosvenor) stating Grosvenor Urban Retail is not a party to the appeal
06/28/2011 On consideration of the notice received from appellee Grosvenor Urban Retail, LP. stating that they are not a party to this appeal, and it appearing that appellant is the only party to this appeal, and it further appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on May 2, 2011, and that briefing is complete, it is ORDERED that the case caption is amended as shown above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division on the record and appellant's brief as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW) elp
06/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/14/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
01/18/2012FiledAppearance by Christopher F. Copenhaver for the appellant (Appellant)
01/18/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Belson Justin Flint, Esq. for appellant
04/11/2012FiledReversed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
05/03/2012FiledMandate