judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MARTIN AND PIFHER

Case Information: 38352
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MARTIN AND PIFHERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D265770Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/17/2002 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/17/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14145
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 28, 2001. 01-14810
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The docketing statement was due to be filed by September 5, 2001. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 01-16921
10/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 01-17217
10/22/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-17744
11/13/2001MotionFiled Motion. Ex Parte Request for Release of Transcript. 01-18900
11/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Ex Parte for Release of Transcript). 01-19394
12/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 13, 2001, appellant filed an "Ex Parte Request for Release of Transcript." This court is unclear whether appellant intended this request to be a request for transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). To the extent that the request is intended to be a request for transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a), we note that the request is procedurally deficient. Specifically, appellant has failed to identify the date and portions of the proceedings to be transcribed and has failed to serve a copy of the transcript request form on the appropriate court reporter/recorder. To the extent that the request is intended to be a motion requesting this court to direct the production of transcripts, the motion is denied. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form that complies with NRAP 9(a). 01-20154
12/14/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 28, 2001. To Court Reporter: Debra Casper. 01-21075
12/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Request for Transcripts filed on 12/14/01. 01-21639
01/15/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01029
02/11/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -- Corrected certificate of mailing for Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare Transcripts. 02-02649
02/11/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-02680
02/19/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-03122
03/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 15, 2002, Transcript/Video Services filed a motion requesting an extension of time to March 10, 2002, to prepare and file a transcript of proceedings held on June 28, 2001. We grant the motion. Transcript/Video Services shall prepare and file the requested transcript by March 11, 2002. In light of that extension, appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by April 10, 2002. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). On February 11, 2002, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. On February 10, 2002, however, respondent filed a "Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Appeal." Accordingly, no action will be taken. 02-03845
03/14/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 28, 2001. Court Reporter: Arlene Blazi. 02-04665
04/11/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/10/02. Signed by: Vincent Ochoa. 02-06432
04/11/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-06433
05/02/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/01/02. Signed by: Kathryn Bliss Holt. 02-07733
05/02/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-07734
05/23/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/21/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 17, 2002, at 2:00 p.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
09/03/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
12/03/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Leavitt and Becker, JJ. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 74. SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-20605
12/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-20696
12/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2003. 02-20696