judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. UNBELIEVABLE, INC. C/W 31591

Case Information: 32017
Short Caption:WHITE VS. UNBELIEVABLE, INC. C/W 31591Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 31591 *, 32017Related Case(s): 31591
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A321426Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/27/1998 / Nitz, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
03/27/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John D. Nitz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/27/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
04/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/17/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
05/07/1998MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
05/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date the required filing fee has not been paid. Appellant shall, within 10 days fo the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to, dismissal of this appeal.
05/12/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison, Kemp & Jones--check no. 000139.
06/09/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. On May 7, 1998, appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals. We grant the motion and consolidate these matters for all appellate purposes. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 31591 and 32017.
06/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook and Margie Carlson. Nos. 31591, 32017.
06/24/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. Nos. 31591 and 32017.
07/31/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 24, 1997; October 27, 1997; October 28, 1997; October 29, 1997; October 30, 1997; October 31, 1997. Court Reporters: Lisa Makowski; Mary Beth Cook. Nos. 31591 and 32017. (filed in 31591).
10/05/1998MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
10/06/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The stipulation filed October 5, 1998 is approved. The appellant's opening brief and joint appendix shall be served and filed on or before October 23, 1998. Nos. 31591, 32017.
10/26/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/23/98. Nos. 31591 and 32017.
10/26/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
11/23/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 9, 1998. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
12/09/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
12/11/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before January 8, 1999. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
01/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31591 and 32017).
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Motion and Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. Alan Warfield pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rules, Rule 42; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Cory M. Jones and J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Consent to Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Verified Application for Assocation of Counsel under Nevada State Supreme Court Rule 42. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Motion and Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Roy G. Weatherup pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rules, Rule 42; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591 and 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Consent to Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Verified Application for Association of Counsel under Nevada State Supreme Court Rule 42. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. (Nos. 31591, 32017).
01/13/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Cohen, Johnson, Day and Clayson regarding service on State Bar and increase of fees - cc: all counsel and State Bar. (Nos. 31591, 32017).
01/14/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension to file Brief. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
02/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 8, 1999, respondent filed a second motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Respondent shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 31591, 32017.
02/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31591, 32017
02/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed February 5, 1999, is denied as moot. By order of the court dated February 4, 1999, respondent's answering brief is due to be filed on or before March 8, 1999. Nos. 31591, 32017.
03/04/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. and copy of Supreme Court Rule 42 Statement from the Law Offices of Cohen firm. Nos. 31591, 32017. (Mailed on: UPS 3/3/99)
03/04/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Brief signed by attorney Weatherup, foreign counsel-Compliance signed by Nevada counsel). Original brief in no. 31591. Nos. 31591, 32017. Mailed on: UPS 3/3/99.
03/15/1999Other Other. Filed Supreme Court Rule 42 Statement for attorney J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
03/15/1999Other Other. Filed Supreme Court Rule 42 Statement for attorney Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591, 32017.
04/07/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/5/99. Nos. 31591, 32017.
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorneys Warfield and Weatherup shall be permitted to appear in this matter on behalf of respondent. Cory M. Jones, Esq., of the law firm of Cohen, Johnson, Day & Clayson shall be responsible for all matters presented herein by respondent. Nos. 31591, 32017.
11/15/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address for law firm of Harrison, Kemp & Jones. Nos. 31591, 32017.
11/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address for law firm of Harrison, Kemp & Jones. Nos. 31591, 32017. (Changed on the docket sheet 11/15/99).
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hr. in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM/MS/NB). Nos. 31591, 32017.
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel: Submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Nos. 31591, 32017.
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER these consolidated appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. (nos. 31591/32017). 00-06782
05/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Nos. 31591 and 32017. Document no. 00-07776
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $250.00.(Nos. 31591 and 32017) 00-08631
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08631