judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-09-0231)
Case Number:S-09-0231Case Docketed On:11/03/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:SINCLAIR OIL CORPORATION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSinclair Oil CorporationJohn A. Sundahl
AppelleeDepartment of RevenueBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Karl D. Anderson
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 122
Citation:238 P.3d 568

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
11/17/2009Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
01/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Sinclair Oil Corporation and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Sinclair Oil CorporationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Sundahl for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-IV, Agency Record (3 boxes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Karl D. Anderson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/13/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John A. Sundahl for appellant; Karl D. Anderson, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Chief Justice Kite filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Voigt joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/13/2010Record - Record returned to district court (one volume)RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/13/2010Record - Record returned to agency - twenty-three volumes returned to the State Board of Equalization. Record receipt signed for by Wendy Soto, Executive Secretary.RecordRecord returned to agencyFinal
09/13/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal