judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ENRIQUE L. MORALES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0185
Short Caption:ENRIQUE L. MORALES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7536-02Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/02/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEnrique L. Morales Y
Donna L. BidermanNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Donna Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donna Biderman, Esquire
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 2, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
05/12/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 14, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 15 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the document has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
05/24/2011MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT to 1 wk. no oppo
06/03/2011RECORD INDEX
06/03/2011RECORD COPIES
06/27/2011ORD GRANT MOT EXTEND TIME FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT to the extent that the statement regarding transcript shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)
07/20/2011LodgedReceived - statement re transcript (Appellant)
07/22/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript and directing briefing
07/22/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
08/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until December 30, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 30, 2011
12/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's mtoion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before February 29, 2012
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and appendix for 40 days after the transcript is completed (Appellant)Granted
04/19/2012FiledOrdered that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order advise this court of what transcript is still otustanding and holding appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix in abeyance
04/26/2012FiledAnswer/Response re status of transcripts. (Appellant)
05/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix (for RT reasons)
07/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (8pgs/Tape) 2/7/11 proc. w/CD
07/19/2012FiledRecord Completed
01/16/2013FiledOrdered that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order
03/12/2013FiledOrdered that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time
03/12/2013FiledLetter From Appellant: Letters (Appellant)
04/01/2013FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
04/10/2013FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to dismiss appeal
04/10/2013FiledDismissed
05/02/2013FiledMandate