judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EUEL D. HARRISON, ET AL. v. M. V. JAY, ET AL.

Case: A-4486
A-4486
01/25/1954
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
EUEL D. HARRISON, ET AL.
M. V. JAY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/15/1954Motion for Rehearing
02/19/1954Appellant's Brief filed
02/18/1954Appellees' Brief filed
01/25/1954Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/15/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/07/1954Opinion issued
02/19/1954Appellant's Brief filed
02/18/1954Appellees' Brief filed
01/25/1954Certified Question filed
01/25/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. V. Jay, et al.Appellee
Euel D. Harrison, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information