judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OLIVERO VS. LOWE C/W 32753

Case Information: 32485
Short Caption:OLIVERO VS. LOWE C/W 32753Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:32485*, 32753 Related Case(s): 32753
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A360960Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/1998 / Crockett, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/11/2000 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/11/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Peccole & Peccole-check no. 2883.
06/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
06/08/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Evidentiary Hearing-3/12/98. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. (Received on 5/26/98, before case was docketed).
06/19/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 3, 1998. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson.
06/24/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
07/09/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/16/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
10/21/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
12/28/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 12/24/98.
12/28/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
01/27/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 1/25/99.
02/11/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 2/10/99.
04/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. These matters involve the same parties and the same district court proceeding. We elect to consolidate these matters for all appellate purposes. Nos. 32485 and 32753.
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 11, 2000 at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hr. in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) Nos. 32485, 32753.
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 32485, 32753.
01/11/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB (Nos. 32485, 32753).
03/24/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Maupin, J. We concur: Shearing, J. and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32485, 32753 00-04729
04/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06226
04/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2000. (Nos. 32485 and 32753). 00-06226