judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRAN HISLER V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0207
Short Caption:FRAN HISLER V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB99-10Filed Date:02/24/2011

Opening Event Date:02/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/30/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorGallaudet UniversityN
Melissa J. Townsend YN
IntervenorPma Insurance GroupN
Melissa J. Townsend YN
PetitionerFran Hisler N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/24/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
02/24/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
02/25/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb, Esq.
04/20/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - Gallaudet University and PMA Insurance Group (no oppo)
04/26/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Gallaudet University and PMA Insurance Group as intervenors in this matter. (ETW)
03/30/2012FiledRecord On Appeal
03/30/2012FiledRecord Completed
04/10/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/21/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
05/21/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
06/15/2012FiledBrief (Intervenor Gallaudet University, Intervenor Pma Insurance Group)
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 8/28/12
08/16/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
08/20/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/30/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
11/30/2012FiledAffirmed
12/28/2012FiledMandate