judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT L. FOSTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0232)
Case Number:S-09-0232Case Docketed On:11/05/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:ROBERT L. FOSTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT L. FOSTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert L. FosterDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 135
Citation:240 P.3d 200

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/05/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/09/2009Event - Phone Call to Office Public Defender, requested that District Court Record be brought to the Supreme Court for review.EventPhone CallFinal
11/12/2009Record - Received unfiled record from Public Defender's Office.RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
11/17/2009Order - Other - Dismissing, in Part, AppealOrderOtherFinal
11/17/2009Record - Record returned to agency with copy of Order Dismissing, In Part, AppealRecordRecord returned to agencyFinal
12/22/2009Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
12/22/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2009Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
12/22/2009Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
12/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Denying permission for court appointed counsel to withdraw and Order Requiring the Public Defender to File Brief Addressing the MeritsOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
01/12/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to Public DefenderRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
02/11/2010Motion - Other - Pro se "Motion for Bond, While Pending Appeal." Hand-written motion also included, text of pleadings similar, Staff Attorney provided copy of both. Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed--already granted IFP status for this appeal. Certificate of service defective, contacted PD & AG to advise motion will be filed.MotionOtherFinal
02/12/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Response/Objection - from Attorney General regarding Motion for bond, while pending appeal.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
03/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Motion for Bond, While Pending AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2010Order - Denying Motion for Bond Pending AppealOrderDenyFinal
03/25/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/13/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/16/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/30/2010Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding decision, and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/26/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal