judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LEON GOFORTH v. FRANK ALVEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND FOR FONDA GAYLE ALVEY

Case: A-4475
A-4475
01/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
LEON GOFORTH
FRANK ALVEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND FOR FONDA GAYLE ALVEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/28/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/1954Response to Motion filed
07/14/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/30/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
06/30/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
06/30/1954Opinion issued
01/28/1954Response to Petition
01/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
01/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank Alvey, individually and as Next Friend for Fonda Gayle AlveyRespondent
Leon GoforthPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information