judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THEIS (NICHOLAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34946
Short Caption:THEIS (NICHOLAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7481Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09795
10/21/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/22/98, 5/28/99, 7/26/99, 8/3/99, 8/4/99. Court Reporter: Polly C. Stipke. 99-10284
11/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11035
11/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11036
11/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11556
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07757
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09498
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/12/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 8, 2000. 00-09498