judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: VALERIE D. PRICE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0117)
Case Number:S-11-0117Case Docketed On:05/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: VALERIE D. PRICE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: VALERIE D. PRICE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantValerie D. PriceSky D Phifer
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
James Michael Causey
John D. Rossetti

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 160
Citation:266 P.3d 940

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
05/06/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/06/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/11/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/29/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/27/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/27/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/29/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/09/2012Correspondence - Outgoing other - letter to Mr. Phifer returning unfiled pleadings because case is closed.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal