judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MULLER VS. PETRELLI

Case Information: 32579
Short Caption:MULLER VS. PETRELLICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D201163Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/29/1998 / Hicks, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/22/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
06/23/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days.
06/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/30/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days.
07/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal.
07/10/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 (Nancy E. Killeen--check no. 1678).
07/10/1998Other Other. Filed certified copy of Order filed in district court on 6/18/98.
07/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Case Appeal Statement.
07/14/1998Other Other. Mailed additional Notice of Appeal documents to Settlement Judge Hicks.
07/21/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 (Alverson Taylor firm--check no.11300).
07/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant).
07/28/1998Other Other. Mailed additional Notice of Appeal documents to Settlement Judge Hicks.
07/31/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Of Cross-Appeal.
11/10/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant/cross-respondent Karen Muller shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement or risk the immediate imposition of sanctions.
11/24/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
12/07/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
01/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/03/1999Other Other. Filed Certificate of Compliance with NRAP 9(a). (No transcripts requested.)
06/01/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 5/27/99).
06/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
07/01/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief and Cross-Appeal. (Mailed on: Fed-ex 6/30/99).
07/01/1999Other Other. Filed Respondent's Errata to Joint Appenidx.
08/02/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 7/30/99).
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 2:00 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB)
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument reminder notice.
01/10/2000Other Other. Oral Argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing appeal and Remand of Cross-Appeal. " . . . we dismiss the appeal, grant the cross-appeal and remand this case to the district court with instructions to quash the bench warrant issued against Petrelli." fn1[All remaining issues raised in this appeal/cross-appeal have been considered by this court and have been found to be without merit.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13991
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14111
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14111