judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RACHELLE L. EARLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0118)
Case Number:S-11-0118Case Docketed On:05/10/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RACHELLE L. EARLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RACHELLE L. EARLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRachelle L. EarleyChristopher Grant Humphrey
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 164
Citation:267 P.3d 561

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/20/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/24/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Christopher G. Humphrey for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/12/2011Order - Other - Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
07/27/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/13/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/11/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Christopher G. Humphrey for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Christopher G. Humphrey, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri Vania Geringer, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal