Case: 05-01-01004-CR
05-01-01004-CR
06/20/2001
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Knight, Jr., Jerry Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/25/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/25/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/05/2002 | Record Retention | Retain | |
04/05/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/05/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/27/2002 | Submitted | | |
03/27/2002 | Submission | | |
03/27/2002 | Submitted | | |
03/07/2002 | Brief Due | | |
03/07/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
02/25/2002 | Submission | | |
02/05/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/05/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
02/04/2002 | Brief Received | | |
02/04/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/23/2002 | Brief Due | | |
12/24/2001 | Brief Due | | |
12/19/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/18/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/27/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/23/2001 | Brief Due | | |
11/21/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/24/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/01/2001 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
09/15/2001 | Record due | | |
06/22/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
06/21/2001 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
06/21/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
06/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/20/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/01/2001 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
05/18/2001 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/25/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jerry Lee Knight, Jr. | Criminal - Appellant | John H. Hagler |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Christina O`neil William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. |
Bridget Barnhill | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Bridget Barnhill |
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F00-72377-NU
Life