judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANGLESE VS. ANGLESE

Case Information: 35651
Short Caption:ANGLESE VS. ANGLESECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D244755Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/24/2000 / Pickering, KristinaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/27/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/15/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stephen R. Minagil, Ltd.--check no. 8770.
02/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-02398
02/24/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristina Pickering. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 28, 2000, we received a letter from the settlement judge indicating that on April 4, 2000, attorney Rovacchi filed in the district court a notice of withdrawal as counsel for respondent. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel to represent her and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. Respondent's counsel will be expected to participate in the settlement conference process. 00-09581
06/19/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Ronald W. Rovacchi. 00-10437
10/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 20, 2000. 00-17621
11/01/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge recommends that this Court remove this case from the settlement conference program and impose sanctions on Mr. Rovacchi and/or his client, awarding Mr. Anglese and his attorney, Mr. Minagil, the fees and costs incurred in attempting to participate in this process. 00-19224
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge recommends that this court impose a monetary sanction against attorney Ronald W. Rovacchi and/or his client. Cause appearing, attorney Rovacchi shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not act upon the settlement judge's determination and recommendation. We agree with the settlement judge that this matter should be removed from the settlement conference program to avoid further delay in the resolution of this matter. Accordingly, appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answsering brief to file and serve the reply brief (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-20415
12/08/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-21478
12/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: December 7, 1999; December 10, 1999; and December 13, 1999. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 00-21479
01/16/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/07/99; 12/10/99; and 12/13/99. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 01-00856
02/20/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 2/16/01. 01-03095
02/20/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-03096
05/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court entered an order in Docket No. 37265 on January 19, 2001, that temporarily suspended respondent's counsel, Ronald Rovacchi, from the practice of law. Consequently, attorney Rovacchi has been unable to act as an attorney since the effective date of his suspension. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel to represent her in this appeal and file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. Respondent shall have 20 days from filing of the notice of appearance to file and serve an answering brief. Failure to retain counsel to represent her in this appeal may result in this appeal being submitted for decision on the opening brief and appendix filed by appellant. Appellant may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 10 days of service of the answering brief. 01-07404
08/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. On May 2, 2001, we directed respondent to obtain new counsel and have counsel enter an appearance within 30 days. To date, no counsel has entered a notice of appearance. Accordingly, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision on the opening brief and appendix filed by appellant. 01-14410
08/27/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. 01-14410
10/04/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Myers & Spretnak, Andrew S. Myers. 01-16707
10/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On May 2, 2001, this court entered an order directing respondent to retain new counsel and have counsel enter an appearance within thirty days. On August 27, 2001, as respondent had not responded to our May 2, 2001, order we entered and order submitting this appeal for decision upon the opening brief and appendix. On October 4, 2001, attorney Andrew S. Myers filed a notice of appearance as counsel for respondent in this appeal. We vacate that portion of our August 27, 2001, order submitting this appeal for decision upon the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall file and serve an answering brief within 30 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-17299
11/26/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/14/01. 01-19760
11/26/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-19762
11/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief. (Made corrections in brief and attached copies of errata to back of briefs.) 01-19875
12/07/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-20561
12/18/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 7, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the reply brief within 10 days from the date of this order. 01-21356
12/31/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/27/01. 01-21889
12/31/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 01-21890
01/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 21, 2000, this court entered an order directing attorney Ronald Rovacchi to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for bad faith participation in the settlement conference program. On January 19, 2001, this court entered an order temporarily suspending Rovacchi from the practice of law. In light of the order of suspension, we conclude that sanctions against Rovacchi are unnecessary. 02-01261
04/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. 02-07017
05/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Change of Firm Name & Address. Myers Chambers, LLP, and Andrew S. Myers. 02-08376
05/13/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-08379
08/29/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondent's Addendum. 02-14999
04/22/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent (attorney Andrew S. Myers). 03-06865
05/13/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Since we conclude that this appeal is moot, we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn6[In light of this order, we deny as moot respondent's counsel's April 22, 2003 motion to withdraw.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-08153
06/10/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-08177
06/10/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/25/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2003. 03-08177