Case Information: 39233 | |||
Short Caption: | MILLER (JOAN) VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178561 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/25/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/25/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 02-03449 | |
02/25/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | ||
03/07/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Notice of Appeal and Case Apeal Statement. | 02-04132 | |
03/08/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Proceedings: January 10, 2002. Court Reporter: Shirley Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: March 4, 2002. | 02-04252 | |
04/03/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 02-05946 | |
04/03/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-05947 | |
04/03/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 02-05948 | |
04/08/2002 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. filed April 3, 2002, seeking an extension of time until April 1, 2002, to file the fast track statement and appendix. The fast track statement and appendix having been filed timely on April 3, 2002, the motion is denied as moot. | 02-06140 | |
04/15/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-06717 | |
04/15/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 02-06718 | |
06/05/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-09813 | |
07/02/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-10421 | |
07/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/16/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2002. | 02-10421 |