Case: 13-01-00625-CR
13-01-00625-CR
09/06/2001
Aggravated Assault
JASON HILLIARD BROWN
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/10/2003 | Exhibits returned | | |||
06/10/2002 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
06/04/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
03/07/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/25/2002 | Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal | | |||
02/25/2002 | Record checked in | | |||
02/21/2002 | Record checked in | | |||
02/07/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/31/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/14/2002 | Motion Filed | | |||
01/14/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/20/2001 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
12/20/2001 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
12/18/2001 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
12/18/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
12/11/2001 | Copy of an order | | |||
11/13/2001 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
11/08/2001 | Letter filed | | |||
11/05/2001 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
10/23/2001 | Certified copy of order received | | |||
10/12/2001 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
10/12/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
09/25/2001 | docketing statement filed | | |||
09/20/2001 | Copy of an order | | |||
09/06/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/04/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BROWN, JASON | Appellant | Thomas F. Greenwell |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Carlos Valdez |
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable J. Manuel Banales
01-CR-1319-D
13 YRS TDC