judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAMS, ARTHUR GERSTENFELD, ROGER

Case Information: 84-CV-1031
Short Caption:WILLIAMS, ARTHUR GERSTENFELD, ROGERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6569-81Filed Date:08/01/1984

Opening Event Date:08/01/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/29/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/17/1985
Argued/Submitted:09/17/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Melvin A. Marshall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas Hylden YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, ARTHUR ET AL GERSTENFELD, ROGER ET AL
08/01/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/29/1985FiledRecord Completed
05/17/1985FiledBriefing Completed
09/17/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/10/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition