Case Information: 39246 | |||
Short Caption: | PUERTA VS. HUNTSBERGER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI14865 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/13/2002 / Eisenberg, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Arthur J. Bayer, Jr.--check no. 2333. | ||
02/26/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-03557 | |
02/26/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/06/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Intent to File (Case Appeal Statement). Appellant will be submitting certified copies as soon as they are received from the district court. | 02-04079 | |
03/08/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on: March 5, 2002. | 02-04212 | |
03/12/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-04442 | |
03/13/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
05/02/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-07756 | |
05/09/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-08129 | |
05/14/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-08454 | |
05/21/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 02-08959 | |
05/30/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | 02-09467 | |
08/30/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on Reno/Carson Msgr. 8/30/02. | 02-15101 | |
08/30/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 02-15102 | |
09/26/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 30, 2002. | 02-16718 | |
10/07/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Because the premature notice of appeal is ineffective, we conclude we lack jurisdiction to entertain this appeal. We grant respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal and "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA | 02-17259 | |
11/01/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-17349 | |
11/01/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/23/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 4, 2002. | 02-17349 |