judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLEGE PARK HOMEOWNERS VS. WASHOE CO.

Case Information: 39237
Short Caption:COLLEGE PARK HOMEOWNERS VS. WASHOE CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9900285
Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903231
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/25/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
02/25/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 cash.
02/25/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 02-03511
05/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellants have failed to file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required documents. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants College Park Home Owners and King.) 02-07816
05/09/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-08180
05/09/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 6, 2001 and December 20, 2001. To Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 02-08181
05/24/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 6, 2001 and December 20, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 02-09215
06/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days. In responding to this order, appellants shall submit documentation that establishes this court's jurisdiction. It appears that appellants can cure the defect by obtaining an amended order, which again must be certified as final under NRCP 54(b). We caution appellants that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Fn2 [We note that appellants must also file an amended notice of appeal.] 02-09824
07/01/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-11279
07/08/2002Other Other. Filed Sierra Nevada College's Reply to Order to Show Cause. 02-11592
07/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In response to our show cause order, appellants explain how the defect occurred, but they have not cured the defect. We cannot waive jurisdictional defects. Accordingly, appellants shall have twenty days from the date of this order within which to obtain entry of an amended order, which must again be certified as final under NRAP 54(b), and to file an amended notice of appeal. We caution appellants that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. 02-11808
07/25/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-12753
08/07/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. 02-13499
09/26/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 02-16692
10/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed. Appellants have cured the defect by procuring entry of an amended order, which corrects the clerical omission in the original order and is certified as final under NRAP 54(b), and by filing an amended notice of appeal. We conclude that this appeal may proceed. Appellants shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-17905
11/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 30, 2002. 02-20262
12/31/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/30/02. 02-22234
12/31/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 02-22235
01/27/2003MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 28, 2003. 03-01438
01/27/2003MotionFiled Stipulation. (Respondent Sierra Nevada College) 03-01451
01/29/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. We approve the second stipulation filed January 27, 2003. Respondent Sierra Nevada College shall have until March 5, 2003, to file and serve its answering brief. The due date for respondent Washoe County Board of County Commissioners' answering brief shall remain February 28, 2003. 03-01554
03/03/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Washoe County's Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/28/03. 03-03446
03/05/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/05/03. 03-03715
03/05/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 03-03716
04/02/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. 03-05563
04/16/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-06455
04/16/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.