judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2897
B-2897
07/29/1971
Application for Writ of Error
LYDA/LOTT
STRESSTEEL CORP., ET AL., TEXSTAR CONSTRUCTION CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/26/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/21/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
09/07/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/23/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
08/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/26/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/20/1971Miscellaneous letter
09/21/1971Response to Petition
09/07/1971Reply to Response
08/23/1971Response to Petition
08/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/05/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stressteel Corp., et al.Respondent
Lyda/LottPetitioner
Texstar Construction Co.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information