judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES (GREGORY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32316
Short Caption:CHARLES (GREGORY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141071Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/16/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Within 120 day from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts. 1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32316, 32369, 32409, 32410, 32430, 32464, 32471, 32482.
11/16/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
11/16/1998Other Other. Case Submitted on Appeal this day.
11/16/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/03/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. (Original and one copy.)
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that the district court did not err and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15270
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15439
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15439