judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER ROBERT HICKS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0086)
Case Number:S-07-0086Case Docketed On:04/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER ROBERT HICKS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER ROBERT HICKS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Robert HicksMichael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 83
Citation:187 P.3d 877

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/09/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel Tina N. Kerin, Appellate CounselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Sylvia Lee Hackl to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/10/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
05/16/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
06/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/17/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/31/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - Motion for stay of briefing schedule or in the alternative extension of time to file briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/04/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - fourth extension - no further to be considered.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
11/07/2007Brief - Appellant, received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, fourteen total volumes. District Court Case number 4563 - Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, confidential folder; District Court Case number 4564 - Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, confidential folder; District Court Case numbers 4563 & 4564 combined; Volumes VI-IX, transcripts; Volume X, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Sylvia Hackl for appellant; Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/04/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Sylvia Lee Hackl for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/12/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for appellant Sylvia Lee HacklMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Michael Henry Reese to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/13/2008Order - Other - Granting motion to withdrawOrderOtherFinal
07/16/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/01/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/01/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/06/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards (3). Record signed for 8/5/08 by Kayci Fuller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal