judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE E. MOBLEY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0607
Short Caption:WILLIE E. MOBLEY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 81-CM-0425 Consolidated:81-CF-0607
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6732-79Filed Date:04/24/1981

Opening Event Date:04/24/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/08/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/12/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/04/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1983

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie E. Mobley, Jr.N
Barbara E. SosnickNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOBLEY JR., WILLIE E. UNITED STATES
04/24/1981NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/08/1981RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/1982BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/04/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/04/1982ARGUED (Mack-Ferren-Kennedy)
02/23/1983AFFIRMED MOJ affirming the judgment on appeal.
04/26/1983MANDATE ISSUED
07/12/1986NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT #86-5140 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall mandate
12/07/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Barbara E. Sosnick, Esquire
12/17/1992APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to appellant's motion to recall the mandate. (see the motion)
01/12/1993ORDER Grant appellee's motion for extension of time to file opposition to appellant's motion to recall mandate, and there being no opposition thereto, appellee shall file it's opposition by January 15, 1993(JWR)
01/15/1993APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's motion to recall mandate
01/25/1993TMC - Motion to Recall the Mandate in no. 81-425. Appellee's Motion for Extension of time to file Oppostion to Motion to Recall the Mandate. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Recall the mandate.
02/25/1993VOTE SHEET - Appellant's motion to recall the mandate - Appellee's motion for extension to file its opposition to motion to recall the mandate - Appellee's opposition (lodged) - MOJ dated February 23, 1983
03/26/1993ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to the motion to recall the mandate. (by: FESTMK)
03/26/1993ORDER DENY APLT MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall the mandate. (by: FESTMK)
04/14/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION order denying motion to recall and to consol w/91-CO-1174
04/15/1993TMC - Appellant's Motion to Reconsider the Order Denying Appellant's Motion to Recall the Manda te in Appeal No. 81-CF-607 and to consolidate this matter with appeal no. 91-CO-1174
04/28/1993VOTE SHEET - Appellant's moiton to reconsider the court's order denying recall of the mandate - Opposition
05/04/1993ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION to recall the mandate. (by: FESTMK)
07/15/1993LETTER from Barbara E. Sosnick, Esq. to Judge Rogers requesting that the court issue a CJA appointment voucher for filing a motion to recall the mandate for appeal # 81-CF-607.
01/21/1994error