judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2918
B-2918
08/18/1971
Application for Writ of Error
FIDELITY UNION LIFE INSURANCE CO.
LELAND EVANS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/31/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
08/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1972Response to Motion filed
03/15/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1972Opinion issued
11/18/1971Response to Motion filed
11/17/1971Motion to dismissOverruled
11/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
08/31/1971Response to Petition
08/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/18/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fidelity Union Life Insurance Co.Petitioner
Leland EvansRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information