Case: B-2924
B-2924
08/23/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERTS S. CALVERT
H. WINSTON HULL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/24/1971 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/19/1971 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/16/1971 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
09/08/1971 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
09/03/1971 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/23/1971 | Appendix Filed | Respondent | | |
08/23/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
08/23/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/26/1972 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/24/1971 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/19/1971 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/16/1971 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
09/08/1971 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
09/03/1971 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/23/1971 | Appendix Filed | | ||
08/23/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/23/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/23/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Houston Endowment, Inc. | Amicus Curiae | |
Roberts S. Calvert | Petitioner | |
ECTOR COUNTY, TEXAS | Amicus Curiae | |
H. Winston Hull, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information