Case Information: 85-CV-1749 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN, JAMES D.C. BOARD OF EDUCATION | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | MPA18-85 | Filed Date: | 12/02/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/02/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/16/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/28/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 07/02/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | James E. Brown | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BROWN, JAMES D.C. BOARD OF EDUCATION (D.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS) | |||
12/02/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
01/16/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/28/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/02/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
07/11/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |