Case Information: 39216 | |||
Short Caption: | TRIDENT PREPAID VS. WILLIAMS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A427322 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/27/2002 / Dentico, Michael | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/06/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/21/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/21/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-03317 | |
02/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/27/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/06/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Extend Time and Notice of Change of Address (extension for case appeal statement and docketing statement). | 02-04101 | |
03/06/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert P. Spretnak - check no. 1299. | ||
03/08/2002 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 6, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the docketing statement and 2 certified copies of the case appeal statement by March 11, 2002. | 02-04265 | |
03/13/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on: March 11, 2002. | 02-04527 | |
03/13/2002 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten and not enough copies. Blank Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant-due date: 10 days. | ||
03/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Michael V. Dentico. (Case Appeal Statement) | ||
03/28/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-05492 | |
04/02/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Michael V. Dentico (Docketing Statement). | ||
05/09/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-08174 | |
05/16/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-08678 | |
06/03/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: December 18, 2001. To Court Reporter: Julie Lever. | 02-09689 | |
06/11/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/18/02. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever. | 02-10144 | |
09/16/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 09/12/02. | 02-16096 | |
09/16/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-16098 | |
09/18/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing: Appellant's Opening Brief & Joint Appendix. | 02-16260 | |
10/15/2002 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Respondent's Answering Brief. | ||
10/28/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/24/02. | 02-18552 | |
10/28/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 02-18556 | |
12/02/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on 11/26/02. | 02-20568 | |
05/06/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-07597 | |
05/06/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/22/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED and REMAND for further proceedings in accordance with this order." Maupin, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. NNP03-RR/MG/WM | 03-14163 | |
08/28/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Robert P. Spretnak. | 03-14544 | |
09/16/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-14356 | |
09/16/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/24/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2003. | 03-14356 |