Case Information: 39221 | |||
Short Caption: | DELEON (EDUARDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C176142 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/16/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/21/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/21/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-03337 | |
04/15/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] In the event that transcripts of the proceedings conducted below on January 29, 2002, have not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to order the prompt preparation of the transcripts; shall have 15 days from the date of entry of the district court's order to transmit a copy of that order to this court; shall have 10 days from the date the transcripts are filed in the district court to transmit certified copies of the transcripts to this court as a supplemental record. | 02-06637 | |
04/25/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 29, 2002. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. | 02-07327 | |
08/16/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 02-14076 | |
08/16/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/19/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 02-21702 | |
01/14/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-00456 | |
01/14/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/24/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 16, 2003. | 03-00456 |