judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2928
B-2928
08/26/1971
Application for Writ of Error
TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANY
M. RUSS LIGHT, DBA AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/16/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/12/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/09/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
08/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/23/1971Response to Motion filed
12/16/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/12/1971Reply to Response
09/27/1971Motion to amend application for writ of error
09/09/1971Response to Petition
09/09/1971Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
08/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. Russ Light, dba American Insurance CompanyRespondent
TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information