judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2932
B-2932
08/27/1971
Direct Appeal
PRESTON SMITH, ET AL.
TOM CRADDICK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/1971Appellees' Brief filed
09/08/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/31/1971Direct Appeal filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/16/1971Opinion issued
09/08/1971Appellees' Brief filed
09/08/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/03/1971Miscellaneous Motion
09/03/1971Motion to dismiss
08/31/1971Direct Appeal filed
08/27/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack G. Kennedy and Henry F. SlagleAmicus Curiae
Tom Craddick, et al.Appellee
Preston Smith, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information