Case Information: 35643 | |||
Short Caption: | O'BREMSKI VS. O'BREMSKI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D126959 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/22/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/14/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Frances-Ann Fine--check no. 1623. | ||
02/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 00-02316 | |
03/01/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-03218 | |
03/01/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/21/99. To Court Reporter: Debbie Casper. | 00-03240 | |
03/13/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 21, 1999. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. | 00-03903 | |
03/30/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/29/00. | 00-05121 | |
03/30/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-05122 | |
04/25/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Due Dates: Retain counsel 30 days. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court to file and serve the answering brief. | 00-06701 | |
05/12/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Mark Anderson hereby submits his notice of appearance on behalf of respondent Robert O'Bremski. | 00-07979 | |
05/31/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/30/00. | 00-09124 | |
05/31/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 00-09125 | |
06/12/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/10/00. | 00-09874 | |
11/22/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 00-20510 | |
11/22/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB). | ||
02/06/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order denying the relocation motion and remand this matter to the district court for entry of written findings of fact and conclusions of law and any further proceedings that the district court deems necessary and appropriate." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-02431 | |
03/06/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-02575 | |
03/06/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/22/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. | 01-02575 |